Financial history FORMBY AND SOUTHPORT DISTRICT COMMUNITY TRANSPORT ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1029590
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £1.89k £1.69k £3.85k £5.05k £4.43k
Total expenditure £14.48k £2.54k £5.49k £4.70k £4.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A