MINSTER PLAYGROUP

Charity Number: 1029592
Charity reporting is up to date (41 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

WE ARE A PRE SCHOOL FOR CHILDREN AGED BETWENN 2 AND 5 YEARS OLD.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £406,876
Total expenditure: £409,414

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 December 1993: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • MINSTER NURSERY GROUP (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dannielle Gray Chair 01 November 2019
None on record
Sarah Mustafa Trustee 15 July 2019
None on record
Annabel Ross Trustee 15 July 2019
None on record
Debbie Harrison Trustee 09 May 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £284.77k £332.80k £402.59k £423.23k £406.88k
Total expenditure £270.10k £270.57k £338.81k £389.82k £409.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £343.14k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 13 March 2025 41 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 13 March 2025 41 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 20 March 2024 49 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 20 March 2024 49 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 20 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 20 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 25 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 25 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Minster Playgroup
Brecon Chase
Minster on Sea
Sheerness
Kent
ME12 2HX
Phone:
01795871120
Website:

minsterplaygroup.co.uk