BENGER BEARS PRE-SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Benger Bears Pre-School is set in the rural village community of Sutton Benger. At Benger Bears Pre-school we aim to provide high quality, affordable and accessible childcare to children aged two and a half to five, in a safe and supportive environment, and to work in partnership with parents in the provision of this childcare.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2022
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 02 December 1993: Standard registration
- BENGER BEARS (Working name)
- BENGER BEARS PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jemma Garland | Chair | 18 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Courtney Rachael Abel-Grainger | Trustee | 17 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lucie Blystad-Collins | Trustee | 17 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Perrett | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katy Devers | Trustee | 03 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Venis | Trustee | 03 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anna Parkinson | Trustee | 06 October 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £65.67k | £77.31k | £56.46k | £44.52k | £73.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £55.91k | £66.02k | £53.65k | £57.75k | £70.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 303 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 303 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 28 October 2024 | 486 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 28 October 2024 | 486 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 09 July 2022 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 09 July 2022 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 24 February 2022 | 239 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 24 February 2022 | 239 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 12 April 2021 | 286 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 12 April 2021 | 286 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 07/09/1993 AS AMENDED ON 22/02/2012
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sutton Benger Village Hall
Chesnut Road
Sutton Benger
Wiltshire
SN15 4RP
- Phone:
- 07791 896683
- Email:
- benger.bears@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window