Trustees BENGER BEARS PRE-SCHOOL
Charity Number: 1029641

Charity reporting is up to date (331 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jemma Garland | Chair | 18 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Courtney Rachael Abel-Grainger | Trustee | 17 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lucie Blystad-Collins | Trustee | 17 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Perrett | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katy Devers | Trustee | 03 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Venis | Trustee | 03 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anna Parkinson | Trustee | 06 October 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.