Financial history CENTRAL OXFORD MOSQUE SOCIETY

Charity Number: 1029645
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £280.81k £109.59k £197.18k £304.27k £340.26k
Total expenditure £316.83k £178.87k £258.55k £392.62k £407.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A