ROTARY CLUB OF STAFFORD TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1029694
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity responds to world disasters making immediate donations to appeals. It supports educational and leadership courses for young people. It makes donations to Rotary Foundation for world wide relief of poverty and disease. It makes donations to good causes local to Stafford, good causes working within the British Isles, and good causes internationally.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £22,723
Total expenditure: £14,844

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 December 1993: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Michael Newman Trustee 01 July 2023
None on record
Councillor Peter Jones Trustee 01 July 2022
THE FOREBRIDGE CHARITY
Received: On time
Gwyn Williams Trustee 01 July 2022
None on record
MICHAEL PHILIP WINKLE Trustee 01 July 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £10.24k £15.76k £15.40k £12.35k £22.72k
Total expenditure £16.76k £11.39k £15.39k £14.30k £14.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 26 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2023 29 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 05 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 23 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 26 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
9 Amblefield Way
STAFFORD
ST16 1SU
Phone:
01785600997