ACACIA PLAYGROUP ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Acacia Pre-school is a community run preschool offering a diverse range of learning opportunities for children between 2 years & 4 years 10 months. We are a member of the Pre-School Learning Alliance and follow the EYFS curriculum to help children with their social, emotional and physical skills and encourage equal opportunities, multi-cultural and special educational needs within our setting.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2019
Total income includes £144,056 from 1 government contract(s) and £778 from 1 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Kingston Upon Thames
Governance
- 08 December 1993: Standard registration
- 14 December 2020: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 14 December 2020: Funds transferred to 1178444 RIVERSIDE PRE-SCHOOL CIO
- ACACIA PRE-SCHOOL (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £114.57k | £121.31k | £120.76k | £180.47k | £193.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £108.73k | £118.70k | £115.03k | £170.93k | £180.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £89.51k | £93.87k | £95.86k | N/A | £144.06k | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.03k | £455 | £0 | N/A | £778 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 16 July 2020 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 16 July 2020 | 16 days late | |
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | 28 June 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | 28 June 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2017 | 28 June 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2017 | 28 June 2018 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
Scheme dated 22 May 2015
Charitable objects
The aims of the Pre-school are to enhance the development and education of children primarily under statutory school age by encouraging parents to understand and provide for the needs of their children through community groups and by: (a) offering appropriate play, education and care facilities, family learning and extended hours groups, together with the right of parents to take responsibility for and to become involved in the activities of such groups, ensuring that such groups offer opportunities for all children whatever their race, culture, religion, means or ability; (b) encouraging the study of the needs of such children and their families and promoting public interest in and recognition of such needs in the local areas; (c) Instigating and adhering to and furthering the aims and objects of the Pre-school Learning Alliance.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE NEW MALDEN
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window