Financial history WESTFIELD PARENTS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1029741
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £3.26k £3.51k £7.60k £16.61k £11.99k
Total expenditure £2.71k £3.61k £6.49k £18.17k £15.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A