WESTFIELD PARENTS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Throughout the year activities have included; book fairs; christmas cards; shopping evening; christmas fair; coffee afternoons; summer fair; pint pot jamboree; chocolate bouquet raffle; school discos and bingo night. All these fund raising activities directly benefits the children in school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 13 December 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Keeley Ford | Trustee | 30 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Andrews | Trustee | 30 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Jacqueline Briggs | Trustee | 23 September 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.26k | £3.51k | £7.60k | £16.61k | £11.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.71k | £3.61k | £6.49k | £18.17k | £15.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 01 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 19 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 09 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 25 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 29 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 04 DECEMBER 1989 AS AMENDED 12 OCTOBER 1993 as amended on 15 Oct 2019 as amended on 22 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
The object of the association is to advance the education of pupils in the school in particular by: Developing effective relationships between the staff, parents and others associated with the school; Engaging in activities or providing facilities or equipment which support the school and advance the education of the pupils.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Westfield Infant School
Vincent Crescent
Chesterfield
S40 3NW
- Phone:
- 01246566124
- Email:
- westfieldpfa@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window