NORTH EAST REGION OF YMCA'S DISCRETIONARY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General Charitable Purposes
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 09 December 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dean Titterton | Trustee | 30 September 2022 |
|
|||||||||||
MOHAMMAD ARIF SHAHAB | Trustee | 30 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
DAVID HODGSON | Trustee | 25 October 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.01k | £615 | £543 | £915 | £649 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.31k | £60 | £96 | £81 | £60 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 22 NOVEMBER 1993
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM BY MAKING GRANTS TO ANY LOCAL ASSOCIATION OF THE YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT
Area of benefit
NORTHUMBERLAND, TYNE AND WEAR, DURHAM,AND REDCAR AND CLEVELAND HARLTEPOOL MIDDLESBROUGH STOCKTON-ON-TEES
Contact information
- Address:
-
Read Milburn & Co
71 Howard Street
North Shields
NE30 1AF
- Phone:
- 01912570355
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window