C AND M MINISTRIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity's objects are the promotion of the Christian faith and supporting the ministry initiated by Dr Clifford and Mrs Monica Hill
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 December 1993: Standard registration
- ISSACHAR MINISTRIES UK (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jennifer Ruth Cooper | Chair | 07 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Clifford Hill | Trustee | 07 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alison Pauline Neurauter | Trustee | 07 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Angela Joy Alfreda Isbister | Trustee | 07 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Neil Harvey | Trustee | 07 December 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £160.78k | £132.55k | £177.44k | £45.65k | £95.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £200.59k | £133.14k | £131.89k | £92.52k | £22.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 17 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 09 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 26/11/1993 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 25/10/2012
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH BY WHATEVER LEGAL CHARITABLE MEANS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bellingham House
2 Huntingdon Street
ST. NEOTS
Cambridgeshire
PE19 1BG
- Phone:
- 07716 112571
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window