Financial history 1066 CHILDMINDING ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1029817
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011
Total gross income £3.02k £2.44k £1.64k £3.67k £1.37k
Total expenditure £1.75k £3.02k £930 £3.11k £967
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A