HAWKESBURY C OF E VC PRIMARY SCHOOL PTA

Charity Number: 1029830
Charity reporting is up to date (90 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Fundraising activities held during the year included social events such as a fun run, ball, and pledge auction.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 September 2023

Total income: £16,344
Total expenditure: £14,681

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • South Gloucestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 December 1993: Standard registration
  • 03 April 2023: Funds received from 1013170 HAWKESBURY PLAYGROUP AND TODDLERS
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • HAWKESBURY UPTON PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sophie Jarrett Trustee 01 October 2024
None on record
Rosamund Latter Trustee 08 September 2022
None on record
Ritchie Jackman Trustee 24 September 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/09/2019 05/09/2020 05/09/2021 05/09/2022 05/09/2023
Total gross income £11.92k £5.00k £9.24k £19.13k £16.34k
Total expenditure £3.68k £11.39k £8.30k £12.58k £14.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 September 2023 03 October 2024 90 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 September 2022 06 September 2023 63 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 September 2021 22 August 2022 48 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 September 2020 13 August 2021 39 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 September 2019 21 September 2020 78 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 September 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Hawkesbury Upton Primary School
High Street
Hawkesbury Upton
BADMINTON
GL9 1AU
Phone:
01454 238629