THE VOICES FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides music education training in state primary schools throughout England
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
Governance
- 07 December 1993: Standard registration
- 09 June 2022: Funds received from 1162432 INDEPENDENT OPERA
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Winifred Mensah | Trustee | 28 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
KATHARINE ROSALIND PAINTER | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|||||||||||
Felix Meston | Trustee | 15 March 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||
Jadis Tillery | Trustee | 15 March 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||
ANNE ELIZABETH RAYMENT-PICKARD | Trustee | 16 December 2011 |
|
|
||||||||||
TIMOTHY JAMES SAINSBURY | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £520.68k | £535.00k | £455.96k | £544.18k | £430.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £516.56k | £500.89k | £443.53k | £545.93k | £493.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £75.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £232.48k | £247.98k | N/A | £346.05k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £276.03k | £277.51k | N/A | £197.88k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £213 | £229 | N/A | £67 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £11.96k | £9.28k | N/A | £191 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | N/A | £60.00k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £515.38k | £486.09k | N/A | £518.70k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £1.17k | £14.80k | N/A | £27.23k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £17.60k | N/A | £12.51k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 23 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 23 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 17 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 17 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 19 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 19 February 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30 APRIL 1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION PASSED 1 DECEMBER 1993
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND PROVIDE FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND IN CONNECTION THEREWITH TO PROMOTE PUBLIC AWARENESS OF THE UNIQUE VALUE OF A SYSTEMISED MUSIC EDUCATION THROUGH CHORAL SINGING
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE MUSIC BASE
KINGS PLACE
90 YORK WAY
LONDON
N1 9AG
- Phone:
- 02075201430
- Email:
- vf@voices.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window