Financial history LITTLE ACORNS PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1029846
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £102.94k £91.37k £69.50k £77.97k £106.45k
Total expenditure £91.07k £90.68k £92.60k £76.12k £105.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £64.68k
Income from government grants N/A £17.73k £8.01k £452 £13.07k