ROTARY CLUB OF CHORLTON AND DISTRICT, MANCHESTER
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Conduct house to house and street collections to raise funds for other charities and our own charitable work. Cooperate with local schools to stimulate leadership and citizenship development, plus literacy incentive. Through acquaintanceship within rotary devise means to identify and satisfy community requirements locally and further afield.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 December 1993: Standard registration
- 18 September 2014: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- ROTARY CLUB OF MANCHESTER SOUTH TRUST FUND (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2009 | 30/06/2010 | 30/06/2011 | 30/06/2012 | 30/06/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.55k | £5.01k | £4.48k | £6.72k | £5.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.69k | £4.16k | £4.08k | £6.82k | £4.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2013 | 19 October 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2012 | 07 March 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2011 | 31 January 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 16 NOVEMBER 1993 AS AMENDED 17 DECEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
TO APPLY THE CAPITAL AND INCOME IN THE RELIEF OF THE POOR AND NEEDY TO SUCH OTHE CHARITABLE PURPOSE, INSTITUTION, SOCIETY OR OBJECT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window