HOUNSLOW UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
EDUCATIONAL AND SOCIAL ACTIVITIES FOR OLDER PEOPLE, NOT IN FULL TIME EMPLOYMENT.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hounslow
Governance
- 21 December 1993: Standard registration
- 19 December 2023: Funds received from 1098804 SPELTHORNE U3A
- HOUNSLOW U 3 A (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philip Dobison | Chair | 13 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Louis Wood | Trustee | 13 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Madeleine Darvill | Trustee | 24 February 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.06k | £3.93k | £2.64k | £2.89k | £4.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.35k | £3.17k | £3.94k | £3.73k | £2.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 January 2025 | 83 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 November 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 MARCH 1993 AS AMENDED ON 8TH SEPTEMBER 1997 as amended on 24 May 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR THE EDUCATION OF MIDDLE AGED AND OLDER PEOPLE WHO ARE NOT IN FULL TIME GAINFULL EMPLOYMENT IN HOUNSLOW AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR LEISURETIME AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE ABOVE PERSONS IN THE INTEREST OF THEIR SOCIAL WELFARE
Area of benefit
HOUNSLOW
Contact information
- Address:
-
33 Orchard Road
HOUNSLOW
TW4 5JW
- Phone:
- 07723395554
- Email:
- chairu3ahounslow@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window