VICTORIA HOUSING PROJECT

Charity number: 1029984
Charity reporting is overdue by 191 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

No longer functioning. Homeless hostel transferred to Havant Housing Association

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Hampshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 December 1993: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOHN CLOYNE Chair
None on record
CELIA ROSE Trustee
None on record
ELIZABETH CLOYNE Trustee
None on record

Financial history

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 191 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 191 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 27 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 11 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 14 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
2 FORDINGTON ROAD
WINCHESTER
SO22 5AL
Phone:
01962620483
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available