THE MALVERNS DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity assists Scout Groups in the Malverns area to promote the development of young people in achieving their full physical, intellectual, social and spiritual potential, as individuals, as responsible citizens and as members of their local, national and international communities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Herefordshire
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 10 December 1993: Standard registration
- Scouts The Malverns (Working name)
- THE MALVERNS DISTRICT SCOUT FELLOWSHIP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Derek Barnes | Chair | 29 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Allan Page | Trustee | 12 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Heath | Trustee | 12 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Johnstone | Trustee | 13 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Page | Trustee | 13 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Neville Cashmore | Trustee | 12 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
ADRIAN Frederick WARD | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.12k | £17.77k | £20.94k | £35.00k | £40.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.12k | £10.37k | £23.34k | £32.00k | £35.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 February 2023 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2020
(These accounts |
08 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 4 JANUARY 1912
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL, SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIALS AS INDIVIDUALS, AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED, IN PRACTICE SOUTHERN PART OF MALVERN HILLS DIST
Contact information
- Address:
-
80 Beauchamp Lane
Callow End
WORCESTER
WR2 4UQ
- Phone:
- 01905830352
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window