ROTARY CLUB OF IRLAM TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1030035
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Relief of poor & needy or other charitable purposes

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £53,900
Total expenditure: £24,663

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Bolton
  • Bury
  • Manchester City
  • Oldham
  • Rochdale
  • Salford City
  • Stockport
  • Tameside
  • Trafford
  • Warrington

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 December 1993: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Taylor Chair
IRLAM AND CADISHEAD DISABLED PERSONS GROUP
Received: On time
IRLAM, CADISHEAD AND DISTRICT LOCAL HISTORY SOCIETY
Received: On time
RIXTON-WITH-GLAZEBROOK COMMUNITY HALL
Received: On time
David Stanley Alletson Trustee 01 January 2025
None on record
Gary Marshall Trustee 04 August 2022
None on record
James Ness Trustee 01 July 2020
RIXTON-WITH-GLAZEBROOK COMMUNITY HALL
Received: On time
David Fairclough Trustee 29 January 2015
None on record
PETER BLAY Trustee
IRLAM AND CADISHEAD DISABLED PERSONS GROUP
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £33.76k £30.21k £28.77k £33.95k £53.90k
Total expenditure £28.72k £21.26k £45.01k £31.17k £24.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 04 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 04 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 24 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 24 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 01 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 01 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 10 May 2022 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 10 May 2022 10 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 08 July 2021 69 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 08 July 2021 69 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Irlam Rotary Club
The Old Station House
Station Road
Irlam
MANCHESTER
M44 5ZR
Phone:
0161 222 4003