Financial history BLAEN WERN FARM CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1030053
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £25.17k £0 £12.75k £24.13k £22.55k
Total expenditure £27.36k £18.53k £18.51k £19.24k £25.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A