Accounts and annual returns V.I.P. VERY INDEPENDANT PEOPLE (SPORTS CLUB FOR CHILDREN AND ADULTS WITH DISABILITIES)

Charity number: 1030061
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2006 02 October 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2006 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2005 22 February 2006 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2004 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2004 Not Required