Accounts and annual returns NEWTON BROMSWOLD AND COURT ESTATE WOMENS INSTITUTE

Charity Number: 1030140
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2008 18 May 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2007 09 November 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2006 30 November 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2005 30 January 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2005 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2004 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2004 Not submitted