Financial history WI AM ROYSTON WOMENS INSTITUTE

Charity Number: 1030141
Charity reporting is overdue by 509 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022
Total gross income £7.65k £7.56k £5.71k £276 £2.03k
Total expenditure £7.87k £7.37k £5.55k £973 £2.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A