ASTON AND COTE WOMENS INSTITUTE

Charity Number: 1030148
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

An educational charity who hold monthly meetings

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £2,201
Total expenditure: £2,157

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Oxfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 December 1993: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
GILLIAN LA FORTE Chair 07 March 2023
None on record
Carole Jones Trustee 12 March 2025
None on record
Deborah Rawle Trustee 12 March 2025
None on record
Gina Salmon Trustee 13 March 2024
None on record
Florence Elizabeth Harper Trustee 13 March 2024
None on record
MELITA HOOK Trustee 26 May 2023
None on record
CAROL ADAMS Trustee 12 March 2019
None on record
Lesley Brown Trustee 09 March 2016
None on record
GILLIAN LONG Trustee
THE BAMPTON WELFARE TRUST
Received: On time
ALLOTMENTS FOR LABOURING POOR
Received: On time
MELITA ELIZABETH HOOK Trustee
ASTON AND COTE COMMUNITY TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £4.50k £0 £2.81k £4.20k £2.20k
Total expenditure £4.41k £854 £2.28k £4.17k £2.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 31 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 24 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 24 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 03 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 07 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
15 Woodbridge Close
Aston
Bampton
OX18 2DB
Phone:
01993850923
Website:

No information available