Accounts and annual returns ASHMORE GREEN WOMENS INSTITUTE

Charity Number: 1030166
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2008 02 June 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2007 22 August 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2006 25 May 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2005 14 March 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2004 20 April 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2004 Not Required