THE M AND S TEACHER CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1030233
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

supprting learning disabled in London area

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout London

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 June 1995: Standard registration
  • 24 July 2023: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
  • 24 July 2023: Funds transferred to 1059050 NORWOOD RAVENSWOOD
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £18 £32 £40 £12 £0
Total expenditure £800 £900 £120 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2022 21 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 09 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 09 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required