SOUTH LAKES U3A

Charity Number: 1030281
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Meetings in interest groups Monthly meetings with speaker open to all members

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £41,491
Total expenditure: £41,217

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Cumbria

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 December 1993: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sharon Millar Trustee 01 July 2024
None on record
Jeffrey Hickin Trustee 10 June 2023
None on record
Mavis Crawford Trustee 10 June 2023
None on record
Samantha Ridgway Trustee 18 May 2022
None on record
Derek Ridgway Trustee 18 May 2022
THE TOC H ALISON HOUSE TRUST
Received: On time
MERCIA MS THERAPY CENTRE LTD
Received: On time
THE KENT ESTUARY YOUTH PROJECT (KEY)
Received: On time
THE OAKLEA TRUST
Received: 3 days late
THE LUNE RIVERS TRUST
Received: On time
Cath Sharpe Trustee 18 May 2022
None on record
Anne Urquhart Trustee 15 May 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £49.61k £14.96k £27.77k £36.09k £41.49k
Total expenditure £45.57k £12.95k £29.00k £38.73k £41.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 06 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 06 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 15 April 2024 75 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 15 April 2024 75 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 23 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 23 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 15 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 19 August 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
7 Wakefield Drive
Endmoor
Kendal
Cumbria
LA8 0BF
Phone:
07399135993