MANCHESTER BANGLADESHI WOMEN'S PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advice/advocacy drop-in, 1:1 practical/emotional support, English language class, Sewing and dress making class, Keep-fit and Yoga class, Employability and Driving Theory class, Mental health project with different activities, Young girls group, Lunch club, Coffee morning, Gardening project, swimming, massage, Summer trip, AGM, international women's week, world mental health day.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £116,310 from 2 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
16 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Manchester City
Governance
- 14 December 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tahmina Doly | Trustee | 26 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jessie Ahmed | Trustee | 24 August 2017 |
|
|||||
Lubna Choudhury | Trustee | 12 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
PEARA BEGUM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROUSHAN ARA PASHA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NURJAHAN AHMAD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr SHIREEN SOBHANI | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £130.37k | £137.79k | £195.04k | £199.74k | £208.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £135.94k | £111.72k | £148.61k | £153.85k | £158.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £71.77k | £115.39k | £167.91k | £173.60k | £116.31k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 JUNE 1993
Charitable objects
TO ESTABLISH A CENTRE FOR THE BENEFIT OF BANGLADESHI WOMEN IN THE CITY OF MANCHESTER.
Area of benefit
CITY OF MANCHESTER
Contact information
- Address:
-
360 DICKENSON ROAD
LONGSIGHT
MANCHESTER
M13 0NG
- Phone:
- 01612573867
- Email:
- info@mbwo.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window