OLI TODDLER GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To enhance the development and education of children under statutory school age by encouraging parents to understand and provide for the needs of their children through the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 25 March 2012
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kingston Upon Thames
Governance
- 15 December 1993: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GINA LEE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 25/03/2008 | 25/03/2009 | 25/03/2010 | 25/03/2011 | 25/03/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £455 | £691 | £453 | £495 | £405 | |
|
Total expenditure | £356 | £654 | £395 | £325 | £320 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 25 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 111 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 111 days | |
Annual return | 25 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 477 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 477 days | |
Annual return | 25 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 842 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 842 days | |
Annual return | 25 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1207 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1207 days | |
Annual return | 25 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1572 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1572 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21ST JULY 1993
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE, OUR LADY IMMACULATE PARISH, TOLWORTH
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 PRINCES AVENUE
SURBITON
KT6 7JL
- Phone:
- 02083906104
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window