Accounts and annual returns WHITEMOOR PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP

Charity Number: 1030323
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 17 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 17 November 2020 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2019 08 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 26 June 2020 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2018 09 April 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 09 April 2019 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2017 04 June 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 06 June 2018 On Time