CLAYMILLS PUMPING ENGINES TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Claymills Pumping Engines Trust was incorporated in 1993 as a non-profit-making body to promote and preserve for the benefit of the public the nineteenth century Claymills Pumping Station complex including all buildings, engines and equipment situate at Meadow Lane, Stretton, Burton on Trent.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 14 December 1993: Standard registration
- CLAYMILLS ENGINES (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW PARSONS | Chair | 12 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Clive Graham Haffenden | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Ian Yates | Trustee | 05 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Christopher Freeman | Trustee | 03 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Geoff Sherratt | Trustee | 16 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN GEORGE GOODMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN ANTHONY FORD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN REEVE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN COOPER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DEREK GOODMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £49.82k | £47.84k | £52.14k | £71.86k | £75.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.60k | £32.76k | £39.45k | £46.91k | £65.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £29.00k | £24.50k | £5.60k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 09 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 04 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 07 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15 NOVEMBER 1993
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE 19TH CENTURY CLAYMILLS PUMPING STATION COMPLEX INCLUDING ALL BUILDINGS ENGINES AND EQUIPMENT THEREIN SITUATE AT MEADOW LANE STRETTON BURTON ON TRENT STAFFORDSHIRE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Claymills Pumping Engines Trust
The Victorian Pumping Station
Meadow Lane
Stretton
BURTON-ON-TRENT
DE13 0DA
- Phone:
- 01283 509929
- Email:
- enquiries@claymills.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window