Accounts and annual returns BROOK GREEN EARLY YEARS

Charity Number: 1030342
Charity reporting is up to date (134 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 11 November 2024 134 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 11 November 2024 134 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 21 July 2023 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 21 July 2023 21 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 28 September 2022 90 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 28 September 2022 90 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 10 November 2021 133 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 10 November 2021 133 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 10 July 2020 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 10 July 2020 10 days late Download Open in new window