Financial history SAXON PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1030373
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £73.94k £87.30k £76.11k £78.24k £84.74k
Total expenditure £69.41k £74.68k £77.44k £81.73k £85.61k
Income from government contracts N/A £74.47k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £60.39k £57.50k £47.27k