GILLINGHAM DIVISION GIRL GUIDES

Charity number: 1030395
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To pass on information from CHQ, Region and County. To enable leaders to meet, share and support one another. By providing training to enable leaders to run their units efficiently.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £299
Total expenditure: £1,651

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Medway

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 December 1993: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Alison Davis Trustee 25 June 2018
None on record
Diane Jury Trustee 19 June 2018
None on record
Hayley Smith Trustee 24 November 2017
None on record
Paula Sharp Trustee 15 March 2017
None on record
TRACEY SNELLINGS Trustee 11 October 2016
None on record
GRACE SLADDEN Trustee 01 July 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £1.34k £556 £164 £109 £299
Total expenditure £337 £2.33k £3.48k £282 £1.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 29 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 11 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 15 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 12 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 03 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
19 HERBERT ROAD
GILLINGHAM
ME8 9BZ
Phone:
01634360502
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available