THE BUTTERFLIES EARLY YEARS CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide day care and equipment . To raise money to pay for pre schools activities. To enhance the development and education of the children primarily under statutory school age.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Devon
Governance
- 15 December 1993: Standard registration
- CHESTNUT HEIGHTS PRE-SCHOOL (Previous name)
- MARGARET CLITHEROE PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- ST MARGARET CLITHEROE PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- ST MARGARET CLITHEROW PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harley Bird | Chair | 04 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Annabelle McDowell | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joseph McDowell | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
sarah soper | Trustee | 05 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
bobbie walsh | Trustee | 05 January 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.08k | £43.95k | £51.55k | £49.55k | £64.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.53k | £34.84k | £50.61k | £51.38k | £55.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 20 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 20 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 691 days | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 08 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 15 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 11 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 27 March 2023 | 635 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9 NOVEMBER 1993 AS AMENDED 29 JUNE 2006.
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING APRENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Margaret Clitherow Rc Primary School
Polhearne Way
BRIXHAM
Devon
TQ5 0EE
- Phone:
- 07977359030
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window