SPITALFIELDS MARKET OPERA LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Tower Hamlets
Governance
- 15 December 1993: Standard registration
- 16 April 2009: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9TH SEPTEMBER 1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 18TH NOVEMBER 1993
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS OF OPERA BALLET MUSIC SINGING DRAMA AND OTHER PERFORMANCE WORKS OF ARTISTIC MERIT. A) BY THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF AN OPERA HOUSE AND THE PRODUCTION THEREIN OF PERFORMANCES OF OPERATIC MUSICAL BALLETIC DRAMATIC OR OTHER ARTISTIC WORKS; B) BY PROVIDING TRAINING AND EDUCATION IN THE FOREGOING BY WAY OF SEMINARS WORKSHOPS LECTURES AND SUCH OTHER METHODS AS THE DIRECTORS THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE LONDON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window