LEVERSTOCK GREEN J M I SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1030438
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The aim of the P.T.A. at Leverstock Green JMI school is to raise money for the benefit of the children of the school. Some of the money raised has been spent on equipment for the classrooms, new playground equipment, growing up talks, visits to the school by bands and pantomimes.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £13,292
Total expenditure: £6,252

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Hertfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 December 1993: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Emma Slater Trustee 03 October 2024
None on record
Donna Mathew Trustee 21 September 2023
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £4.07k £5.73k £8.50k £11.97k £13.29k
Total expenditure £12.47k £4.02k £4.89k £12.92k £6.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 13 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 30 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 29 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 27 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 08 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Leverstock Green C Of E Primary
Green Lane
HEMEL HEMPSTEAD
Hertfordshire
HP2 4SA
Phone:
01442406520
Website:

No information available