Financial history ROTARY CLUB OF VERWOOD TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1030450
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £29.38k £1.75k £32.05k £31.10k £35.30k
Total expenditure £27.06k £3.77k £31.90k £32.11k £27.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A