BETWS-Y-COED WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1030534
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Information on the charity's activities is not available.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2007

Total income: £1,127
Total expenditure: £1,651

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
No information available
Who the charity helps:
No information available
How the charity helps:
No information available
Where the charity operates:
  • Conwy
  • Gwynedd

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 December 1993: Standard registration
  • 23 June 2008: Removed (Voluntary removal)
Organisation type:
Other names:
  • BETWS-Y-COED WI (Working name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2004 30/09/2006 30/09/2007
Total gross income £1.37k £1.56k £1.13k
Total expenditure £1.21k £1.66k £1.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2007 05 June 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2007 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2006 09 July 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2006 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2005 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2004 16 December 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2004 Not Required