Financial history THORNHAM PARISH HALL

Charity number: 1030553
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £7.40k £13.08k £8.90k £10.49k £15.56k
Total expenditure £5.28k £14.53k £17.74k £10.72k £8.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £761 £660
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A £3.10k £3.22k