NATIONAL JUSTICE MUSEUM

Charity Number: 1030554
Charity reporting is up to date (60 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To maintain the heritage site of the Shire Hall and its collections for access by the general public to learn about the law and its history. Through Education programmes, deliver citizenship (legal literacy, community involvement, understanding social and moral rights and responsibilities), history, crime prevention, to young people.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 December 1993: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • GALLERIES OF JUSTICE (Working name)
  • HELP A NOTTINGHAMSHIRE CHILD (Working name)
  • NATIONAL CENTRE FOR CITIZENSHIP AND THE LAW (NCCL) (Working name)
  • NCCL GALLERIES OF JUSTICE (Working name)
  • MUSEUM OF LAW (Previous name)
  • MUSEUM OF LAW TRUST COMPANY (Previous name)
  • THE EGALITARIAN TRUST (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PAUL BOWDEN LLB LLM Chair 10 March 2015
THE KISS FOUNDATION UK
Received: On time
CHESTER DIOCESAN BOARD OF EDUCATION
Received: On time
Vanessa Shaw Trustee 27 March 2025
None on record
Ben Phillip Matthew Yallop Trustee 20 June 2024
None on record
Lily Walker-Parr Trustee 20 June 2024
None on record
Clive Foster Trustee 20 June 2024
None on record
Ryan Holford Trustee 20 June 2024
None on record
Katherine McNamara Trustee 16 September 2022
None on record
Helen Emmett Trustee 16 September 2022
The Marcellus Baz Foundation
Received: On time
Jennifer Ann Chapman Trustee 18 June 2020
None on record
Nicholas Williams Trustee 20 September 2018
None on record
Struan Duncan Campbell Trustee 20 September 2018
None on record
His Honour Roger Graham Chapple Trustee 16 March 2017
None on record
JENNIFER SPENCER Trustee
BUXTON CRESCENT HERITAGE TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.61m £1.40m £1.51m £1.82m £1.81m
Total expenditure £1.72m £1.36m £1.54m £1.75m £2.03m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £25.00k £493.68k £149.36k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £65.40k £502.47k £205.48k £47.70k £102.05k
Income - Other trading activities £171.50k £9.56k £117.26k £184.23k £241.53k
Income - Charitable activities £1.37m £884.35k £1.19m £1.58m £1.46m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £270 £399 £512 £594 £2.00k
Income - Other £280 £240 £745 £235 £3.42k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.59m £1.35m £1.45m £1.62m £1.85m
Expenditure - Raising funds £130.06k £17.34k £86.92k £136.73k £181.32k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £25.52k £14.03k £19.10k £29.18k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £926.91k £868.51k £849.97k £1.47m £1.34m
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £811.24k £932.11k £858.11k £670.88k £717.53k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £362.53k £392.26k £339.94k £292.83k £418.41k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 01 April 2025 60 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 01 April 2025 60 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 29 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 29 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 03 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 03 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 30 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 30 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
SHIRE HALL
HIGH PAVEMENT
NOTTINGHAM
NG1 1HN
Phone:
01159520555