RELIEF OF ORPHANS FUND, ST PETERSBURG
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A small Manchester-based charity dedicated to supporting poor and vulnerable children and families who foster children in and around St Petersburg, Russia.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Russia
Governance
- 17 December 1993: Standard registration
- 31 July 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- R O O F ST PETERSBURG (Working name)
- ROOF ST PETERSBURG (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2013 | 01/04/2014 | 01/04/2015 | 01/04/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.11k | £1.69k | £2.49k | £2.41k | £3.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.93k | £3.55k | £2.40k | £3.45k | £2.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 28 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2016 | 27 March 2017 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2015 | 24 July 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 2 DECEMBER 1993
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE POVERTY OF CHILDREN RESIDENT IN ST PETERSBURG RUSSIA WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS ARISING THEREFROM AND TO RELIEVE AND PROTECT THEIR GOOD HEALTH AND TO RELIEVE THE SICKNESS OF SUCH CHILDREN.
Area of benefit
ST PETERSBURG RUSSIA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window