Financial history RAINBOW PRE-SCHOOL (AYLESBURY)

Charity number: 1030624
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £63.47k £66.95k £69.06k £82.23k £105.14k
Total expenditure £63.88k £69.55k £59.74k £69.00k £84.30k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £52.84k £59.56k £10.46k N/A £7.11k