Financial history REGAIN - THE TRUST FOR SPORTS TETRAPLEGICS

Charity number: 1030693
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £360.19k £71.13k £77.47k £92.78k £83.17k
Total expenditure £281.09k £132.60k £114.19k £136.54k £152.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A