Trustees REGAIN - THE TRUST FOR SPORTS TETRAPLEGICS
Charity number: 1030693

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LORD IVAR MOUNTBATTEN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Ivan Jones | Trustee | 30 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Smith | Trustee | 22 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Killick | Trustee | 13 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Miles Quentin Dean | Trustee | 05 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
PAUL COLEMAN | Trustee | 26 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
DOMINIC COLEMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.