THE RIVERSIDE PLAYGROUP (TWICKENHAM)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are an early years pre-school that take children from 2 1/2 to school age.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £38,196 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Richmond Upon Thames
Governance
- 21 December 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Juliette WINDSOR | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Jacqueline Ellison | Trustee | 19 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
Philomena Patterson | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £79.45k | £84.00k | £83.79k | £85.51k | £51.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £82.59k | £77.00k | £85.77k | £85.55k | £65.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £46.68k | £52.17k | £46.53k | £58.04k | £38.20k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 03 September 2024 | 65 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 03 September 2024 | 65 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 21 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 21 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 05 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 05 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 14 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 01 April 2022 | 275 days late | |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 28 September 2020 | 90 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2019
(These accounts |
28 September 2020 | 90 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24TH NOVEMBER 1993
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
York House
Richmond Road
Twickenham
TW1 3AA
- Phone:
- 02087442459
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window