SWINDON MUSIC FESTIVAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the Swindon Music Festival is to advance the education of the public in the Arts, and in particular the Arts of Music, in all their branches, primarily by holding an annual competitive festival.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Swindon
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 23 December 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Menna Jackson | Trustee | 04 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Summers | Trustee | 04 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Valerie Jones | Trustee | 01 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
DAWN BALL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Yvonne Walker | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GEOFF WALTERS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.89k | £500 | £6.29k | £8.51k | £8.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.38k | £420 | £7.61k | £8.32k | £8.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 13 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 01 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 06 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 AUGUST 1992
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS AND IN PARTICULAR THE ARTS OF MUSIC SPEECH AND DANCE IN ALL THEIR BRANCHES
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE SWINDON AND NORTH WILTSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 BOURTON AVENUE
SWINDON
SN3 4LY
- Phone:
- 01793823849
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window