DUNELM GROVE PRE-SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Dunelm Grove pre-school in West Norwood, provides a safe and fun, family feel environment for education, play and socialisation, to enhance the development of children between 2 and 5 years old. We support our community and enjoy diversity of culture, languages and welcome those with special needs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £67,055 from 3 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Lambeth
Governance
- 21 December 1993: Standard registration
- 09 December 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
- 17 July 2019: Re-registered
- DUNELM PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
sharon monan | Trustee | 29 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Wright | Trustee | 29 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
LINDA WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £82.84k | £69.30k | £86.25k | £65.78k | £71.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £87.92k | £72.91k | £81.19k | £69.38k | £65.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £64.43k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £69.13k | £57.11k | £74.40k | N/A | £67.06k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 March 2025 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 March 2025 | 46 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 June 2024 | 139 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 June 2024 | 139 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 April 2023 | 86 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 April 2023 | 86 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 July 2022 | 162 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 12 July 2022 | 162 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 April 2021 | 72 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 13 April 2021 | 72 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 SEPTEMBER 1992
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 DUNELM GROVE
LONDON
SE27 9JP
- Phone:
- 0206702498
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window