Accounts and annual returns HOUGHTON REGIS PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1030736
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 28 July 2024 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 20 July 2023 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 30 March 2022 58 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 March 2022 423 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 30 March 2022 789 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required